CA ACR45 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to early care and education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early care and education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-08 - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR45 Weber By Liu (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-15AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-15AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
2013-08-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 2473.).
2013-08-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2013-07-08SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 1688.)
2013-06-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-10SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-29SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-21SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2013-05-20AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1510.)
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2013-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
2013-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2013-04-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2013-04-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2013-04-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=acr_45&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130411_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130502_amended_asm_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130502_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130520_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130610_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130411_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130502_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130520_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130610_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130813_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_bill_20130815_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_vote_20130508_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/acr_45_vote_20130708_0212PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback