CA ACR4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Joel Mendenhall Memorial Highway.
Title
Joel Mendenhall Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Assembly - ACR4 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR4 Waldron (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - ACR4 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR4 Waldron (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - ACR4 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2256.). |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1756.) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.) |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-12-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-12-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |