CA ACR175 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-21)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-21)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Red Ribbon Week.
Title
Red Ribbon Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR175 Ian Calderon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4954.) |
2014-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6448.) |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 25). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |