CA ACR166 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Dropout Recovery Week.
Title
Dropout Recovery Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR166 Atkins By Leno (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4498.) |
2014-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5846.) |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |