CA ACR152 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-5)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-5)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to patient centered medical homes.
Title
Patient centered medical homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR152 Pan By Monning (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 4495.) |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5807.) |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (June 10). |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |