CA ACR141 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-19)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-19)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to American Stroke Month.
Title
American Stroke Month 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent #17 ACR141 Holden (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-07-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4146.) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5089.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |