CA ACR134 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Officer Michael Crain Memorial Highway.
Title
Officer Michael Crain Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Linder [R] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] |
Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR134 Linder (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 134 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 134 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-07-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4145.) |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4967.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |