CA ACR122 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Bone Marrow Donation Awareness Month.
Title
Bone Marrow Donation Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #15 ACR122 Beth Gaines (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3537.) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4708.) |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |