CA ACR113 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-18)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-18)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to epilepsy awareness.
Title
Epilepsy awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR113 Hagman By Fuller (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3188.) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4171.) |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |