CA ACR101 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pawnbrokers and secondhand dealers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pawnbrokers and secondhand dealers: Internet transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-21 - ACR 101 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR101 Jones-Sawyer By Hill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - ACR 101 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-09AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m.
2014-08-21AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6302.).
2014-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2014-08-20SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4650.)
2014-08-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-06-30SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-15SenateFrom committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 10).
2014-05-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2014-05-05SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2014-05-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4746.)
2014-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2014-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2014-02-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2014-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=acr_101&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_bill_20140219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_bill_20140616_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_bill_20140822_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_bill_20140909_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140325_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140409_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140505_1257PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140630_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140820_1208PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/acr_101_vote_20140821_1154AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback