CA AB983 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on August 27 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-09-08 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 21702.5, 21705, 21706, and 21713 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to self-service storage facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-service storage facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-27 - AB 983 MELENDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB983 Melendez By Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-10 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - AB 983 MELENDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6577.).
2014-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4858.).
2014-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2014-06-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-07-03SenateIn committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2013-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-05-23SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2013-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1337.)
2013-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 7).
2013-04-30AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2013-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2013-03-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and B.,P. & C.P.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_983&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20130411_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20130411_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20140615_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20140701_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20140822_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_bill_20140903_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20130409_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20130507_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20130509_1130AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20130610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20130702_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20130702_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20140624_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20140826_0459PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_983_vote_20140827_0245PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback