CA AB97 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1622, 14002, 14501, 17582, 33127, 35035, 35735.1, 37700, 37710.3, 37710.5, 41020, 41303, 41544, 42127, 42238.15, 42280, 42281, 42282, 42283, 42284, 42285, 42285.5, 42286, 42287, 42289, 42289.1, 42289.2, 42289.3, 42289.4, 42289.5, 42800, 46200, 46201, 46201.2, 46202, 47604.32, 47604.33, 47604.5, 47605, 47605.6, 47613, 47631, 47632, 47635, 47636, 47660, 47663, 48310, 48359.5, 49085, 49536, 52052, 52052.1, 52052.5, 52055.750, 56365, 56366.1, 56836.21, and 56836.24 of, to amend and repeal Sections 42238, 42238.1, 42238.2, and 42238.5 of, to add Sections 35736.5, 42238.01, 42238.02, 42238.025, 42238.03, 42238.04, 42238.05, 42238.051, 42238.052, 42238.053, 42238.06, 42238.07, 46207, 46208, 47606.5, and 47607.3 to, to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 52060) to Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add Chapter 12.5 (commencing with Section 2574) to Part 2 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to repeal Sections 14002.3, 17583, 17584, 17584.1, 17584.2, 17585, 17587, 35735.2, 42282.1, 42283.1, 42283.2, 42285.1, 42285.4, 42605, 42606, 46201.3, 46204, 47612.7, 47632.5, 47664, 52051, and 52052.2 of, and to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 52053), Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 52055.600), and Article 4 (commencing with Section 52056) of Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, to amend Sections 7906 and 50286 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 33492.78, 33607.5, and 33684 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 95 and 196.4 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to school finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
School finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Assembly - AB 97 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB97 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB97 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Lay on Table (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 97 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB97 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB97 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Lay on Table (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 97 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:50 p.m. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2017.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2017.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 2018.). |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1367.). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 1337.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1400.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |