CA AB938 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89712 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB938 Weber By Block (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 938 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 938 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4654.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1782.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1507.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66025.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 89700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |