CA AB837 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act amend Section 7522.04 of the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
Public employees' retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 837 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB837 Wieckowski By Wyland (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 837 CAMPOS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB837 Wieckowski By Wyland (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 837 CAMPOS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 6619.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6458.) |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4809.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2013-09-06 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1577.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |