CA AB808 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13405, 13410, 13411, 13413, 13420, 13421, 13440, 13440.5, 13442, 13450, 13460, 13470, 13470.5, 13471, 13472, 13477, 13480, 13481, 13482, 13485, 13486, 13500, 13501, 13502, 13530, 13531, 13532, 13535, 13550, 13570, 13590, 13591, 13592, 13595, 13600, 13700, 13710, 13711, and 13741 of, to amend the headings of Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 13400) of, Article 2 (commencing with Section 13410) of Chapter 14 of, Article 5 (commencing with Section 13440) of Chapter 14 of, Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 13446) of Chapter 14 of, Article 6 (commencing with Section 13450) of Chapter 14 of, Article 8 (commencing with Section 13470) of Chapter 14 of, and Article 13 (commencing with Section 13550) of Chapter 14 of, Division 5 of, to add Section 13404.5 to, to repeal Sections 13401, 13402, and 13403 of, and to repeal and add Sections 13400 and 13446 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to automotive fuels and products.
Title
Automotive fuels and products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 808 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB808 Ridley-Thomas By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 808 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB808 Ridley-Thomas By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 808 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 3. Page 2918.). |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2457.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and T. & H. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 1635.) |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B. & P. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |