CA AB8 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41081, 44060.5, 44125, 44225, 44229, 44270.3, 44271, 44272, 44273, 44274, 44275, 44280, 44281, 44282, 44283, 44287, 44299.1, and 44299.2 of, to add and repeal Section 43018.9 of, and to repeal Section 44299 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 42885 and 42889 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 9250.1, 9250.2, 9261.1, and 9853.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicular air pollution, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alternative fuel and vehicle technologies: funding programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB8 Perea Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB8 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - AB8 PEREA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB8 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - AB8 PEREA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3227.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3249.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 2340.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 2203.). |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 6). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |