CA AB724 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12814.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: driver's licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-22 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2013-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2013-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code12814.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback