CA AB711 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3004.5 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to hunting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting: nonlead ammunition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-10 - AB 711 RENDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB711 Rendon By Lieu (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - AB 711 RENDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2013-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 3109.).
2013-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2266.).
2013-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2013-06-24SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-06-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11).
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 21. Page 1461.)
2013-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 8).
2013-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 16).
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2013-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code3002Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code3004.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_711&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130417_amended_asm_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130417_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130612_amended_sen_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130612_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130221_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130417_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130612_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130903_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130904_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_bill_20131011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130416_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130508_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130516_1101AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130611_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130830_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130909_0644PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0701-0750/ab_711_vote_20130910_0148PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback