CA AB65 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 261 and 286 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Crimes: sex crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 65 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB65 Achadjian Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 65 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB65 Achadjian Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 65 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2576.). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1857.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1007.). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 286 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 289 | Amended Code | Citation Text |