CA AB6 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 9023 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiatives: paid circulators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-31 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB6 Saldana By Corbett (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - AB6 SALDANA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-08 Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2009-09-01 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2009-08-31 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2011.)
2009-08-17 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-07-23 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-07-08 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
2009-06-04 Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
2009-05-28 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-28 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 1761.)
2009-05-18 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-14 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
2009-04-29 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-28 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-27 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21).
2009-04-13 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2009-03-27 Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2008-12-02 From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2008-12-01 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code9023New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_6&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_bill_20090326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_bill_20090413_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_bill_20090428_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_bill_20090903_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_vote_20090421_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_vote_20090513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_vote_20090528_0142PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_vote_20090707_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_6_vote_20090831_0439PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback