CA AB59 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5348 and 5349.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Mental health services: assisted outpatient treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Assembly - AB 59 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB59 Waldron By Hall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 59 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB59 Waldron By Hall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 59 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5875.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4954.). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3505.) |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-12-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. |
2014-12-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5346 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5347 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5348 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5349 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5349.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5349.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5349.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |