CA AB585 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 713 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs: use of real property.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 585 FOX Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB585 Fox By Roth (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 585 FOX Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB585 Fox By Roth (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 585 FOX Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6318.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.) |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4653.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3684.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3635.) Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (January 14). |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and V.A. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 713 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |