CA AB551 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 406, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 406, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.3 (commencing with Section 51040) to Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 5 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 402.1 of, and to add Section 422.7 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: urban agriculture incentive zones.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 551 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB551 Ting By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 551 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB551 Ting By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 551 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 406, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 3103.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2252.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Measure version as amended on July 9 corrected. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1746.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 422.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |