CA AB550 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14841 of, and to add Section 14838.6 to, the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: Office of Small Business and Disabled

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2013-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9).
2013-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2013-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14838.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14838.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14839Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14841Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_550&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_bill_20130314_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_bill_20130416_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_bill_20130314_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_bill_20130416_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_550_vote_20130409_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback