CA AB52 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5097.94 of, and to add Sections 21073, 21074, 21080.3.1, 21080.3.2, 21082.3, 21083.09, 21084.2, and 21084.3 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to Native Americans.
Title
Native Americans: California Environmental Quality Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 52 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB52 Gatto By Wyland (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - AB 52 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB52 Gatto By Wyland (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - AB 52 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6651.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4891.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2315.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2315.) |
2013-09-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 2200.) |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 1780.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1786.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2012-12-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 23. |
2012-12-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21073 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21074 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.3.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.3.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21082.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21083 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21083.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21083.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21084.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21084.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21097 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5097.94 | Amended Code | Citation Text |