CA AB500 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 16520, 16540, 16850, 23510, and 28220 of, and to add Sections 17060, 25135, and 28255 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB500 Ammiano By Hancock (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By MORRELL Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB500 Ammiano By Hancock (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 500 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By MORRELL Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 3099.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2255.). |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 1725.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 17060 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 23510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 28220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28255 | New Code | See Bill Text |