CA AB48 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32310 of, and to add Section 32311 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: large-capacity magazines.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] |
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 Skinner By Block (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading Amend By JONES Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading Amend By MELENDEZ Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 Skinner By Block (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading Amend By JONES Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 48 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading Amend By MELENDEZ Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 3196.). |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2313.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1730.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2012-12-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 20. |
2012-12-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 16740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16740.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 16890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30302.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30327 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30367 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 32310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 32311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 32390 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |