CA AB47 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8594.15 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: hit-and-run incidents.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 47 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB47 Gatto By Knight (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 47 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB47 Gatto By Knight (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 47 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6618.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6379.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 4710.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator De León. |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1659.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2012-12-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 19. |
2012-12-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8594.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 653.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |