CA AB460 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1374.55 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10119.6 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: infertility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-30 - AB 460 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB460 Ammiano By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - AB 460 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2771.).
2013-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1986.).
2013-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
2013-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 1511.)
2013-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
2013-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2013-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1374.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10119.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_460&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20130219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20130605_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20130219_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20130605_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20130820_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20130905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_bill_20131008_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130430_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130508_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130520_0122PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130626_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130826_0232PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_460_vote_20130830_0953AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback