CA AB46 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 11350.5 and 11377.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11350.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11377.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |