CA AB46 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89227 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
California State University: online education.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 46 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB46 Pan By Evans (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 46 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB46 Pan By Evans (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 46 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6537.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 25). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4554.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 18). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 996.) |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10). |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2012-12-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 19. |
2012-12-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89227 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10828 | New Code | See Bill Text |