CA AB423 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-28 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-28 - Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 94923.5 to the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Student Tuition Recovery Fund: claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB423 Brown By Torres (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 423 TORRES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 423 TORRES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4894.). |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1480.) |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94923.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34176.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2085.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1752.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1752.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |