CA AB420 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 660, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 660, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48900 of the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.
Title
Pupil discipline: suspensions and expulsions: willful defiance.
Sponsors
Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. John Perez [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 420 DICKINSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB420 Dickinson By Block (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 420 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB420 Dickinson By Block (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 420 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 660, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 6270.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 4611.). |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Liu. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 1808.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |