CA AB4 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 17.1 (commencing with Section 7282) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: federal immigration policy enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-10 - AB4 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB4 Ammiano By De Le (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - AB4 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
2013-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 3086.).
2013-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2259.).
2013-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2).
2013-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 1445.)
2013-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9).
2013-01-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2012-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2012-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7282New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_4&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20130614_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20130624_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20130614_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20130624_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20130904_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_bill_20131005_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_vote_20130409_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_vote_20130516_0938AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_vote_20130702_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_vote_20130909_0529PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_4_vote_20130910_1204PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback