CA AB383 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1202, 4836.1, 4999.32, 5096.10, 21609.1, 23958.4, 25502.2, and 25600.2 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 55.56, 56.16, 1195, 1950.5, 2877, 2923.55, 2924.8, 2924.19, 2950, and 3509 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 116.940, 425.50, 684.115, and 1282.4 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 7237 of, and to amend and renumber the heading of Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 15900) of Title 2 of, the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 15282, 17193.5, 17250.25, 18720, 22138.5, 33195, 35583, 38000, 41320.1, 41326, 47660, 48853, 48853.5, 48900, 48902, 48911, 49076, 49548, 52052, 60200.8, 60209, 60605.87, 60852.1, 66407, 81378.1, and 88620 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 2162, 2224, 2225, 3111, 13115, and 21000 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 3047, 3200.5, and 4055 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 1587 and 15100 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 4101.3, 4106, 14611, 19447, 55527.6, and 64101 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 3513, 3527, 7522.20, 7522.56, 7522.57, 7522.72, 8164.1, 11019, 11020, 11435.15, 11552, 12460, 12838.14, 12926, 14837, 15820.922, 19815, 20391, 20410, 20516, 20677.7, 25060, 25062, 65040.7, 65302.5, and 65915 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 3.1 (commencing with Section 8240) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, to amend and renumber Sections 15606.5, 15814.25, and 15819.30 of, to repeal Section 7480 of, and to repeal the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 15570) of Part 8.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 80.2 and 82 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 80) of Division 1 of, the Harbors and Navigation Code, to amend Sections 1339.40, 1339.41, 1367.65, 1531.15, 11378, 11755, 25110.11, 34177, 34183.5, 39053, 39510, 39710, 39712, 39716, 39718, 106985, 114365.5, 114380, 116565, 120365, 123327, 123940, 123955, 125286.20, 128570, 129725, and 136000 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 395, 676.75, 922.41, 1063.1, 1754, 10113.71, 10124, 10271, 11665, and 12694.1 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 980, 4709, and 5502 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 136.2, 166, 171c, 273.6, 289.6, 496a, 626.95, 626.10, 781, 830.41, 830.55, 1001.20, 1170, 1203.097, 1203.4a, 1230, 1370.1, 2602, 3000.08, 3060.7, 4024.2, 4115.55, 5072, 6030, 11165.7, 11166, 12022, and 12022.1 of, and to repeal the heading of Title 4.5 (commencing with Section 13600) of Part 4 of, the Penal Code, to amend Sections 10295.6 and 20651.7 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4629.5, 4629.9, 6224.5, 21080.37, 21080.5, 21084, and 72410 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 2827.10, 2862, 5142, 5143, 9506, and 185035 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 2188.6, 7285.3, 17276.20, 18152.5, 18738, 23685, 24416.20 of, and to amend and renumber Section 24900 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 1755 and 14211 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, to amend Sections 11205, 12804.11, 16028, 23612, 34510.5, and 40000.20 of the Vehicle Code, to amend Section 85057.5 of the Water Code, to amend Sections 366.21, 366.22, 366.25, 4141, 4427.5, 4648, 4684.53, 5008, 5328.03, 6254, 7295, 12306, 14005.27, 14043.25, 14043.7, 14132.275, 14132.276, 14169.32, 14182, 14182.16, 15630, 15650, and 18969 of, and to repeal Section 4792.1 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend Section 1 of Chapter 357 of the Statutes of 2012, to amend Section 1 of Chapter 513 of the Statutes of 2012, to amend Section 1 of Chapter 541 of the Statutes of 2012, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 719 of the Statutes of 2012, relating to maintenance of the codes.
Title
Maintenance of the codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Assembly - AB 383 WAGNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB383 Wagner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Assembly - AB 383 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB383 Wagner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Assembly - AB 383 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2295.). |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1608.). |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2013-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 801.) |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |