CA AB336 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 782.1 to the Evidence Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: prostitution: evidence.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB336 Ammiano By Mitchell (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 336 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 336 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By AMMIANO Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Assembly - AB 336 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 336 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By AMMIANO Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4880.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 1877.) |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.) |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1720.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 782.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 653.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |