CA AB335 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 138.4, 3550, 4060, 4061, 4658.5, and 5401 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation: notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-09-08 - AB 335 SOLORIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB335 Solorio By Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - AB 335 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2011.
2011-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
2011-09-08 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3071.).
2011-09-07 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2011-09-07 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2352.).
2011-09-01 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-31 Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-08-30 From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
2011-08-22 Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
2011-08-17 Ordered to special consent calendar.
2011-07-13 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-07-12 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2011-06-23 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-08 Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2011-06-01 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-06-01 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1718.)
2011-05-31 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-27 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-04-13 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-03-30 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-02-24 Referred to Com. on INS.
2011-02-11 From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2011-02-10 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code138.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3550Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4060Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4061Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4658.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code5401Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_335&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_bill_20110210_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_bill_20110527_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_bill_20110831_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_bill_20110920_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_bill_20111007_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110330_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110527_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110601_0221PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110622_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110711_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110907_0337PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_335_vote_20110908_0522PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback