CA AB33 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical corporations: energy storage systems: long duration bulk energy storage resources.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 33 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 33 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 33 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6528.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5296.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4966.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4976.) |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c) . |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 1858.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38561.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2836.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |