CA AB32 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 502 of the Penal Code, relating to computer crimes.
Title
Computer crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 32 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB32 Waldron By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Assembly - AB 32 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB32 Waldron By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Assembly - AB 32 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2745.). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.). |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 854.) |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |