CA AB319 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 53165) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local agencies.
Title
Local agencies: domestic violence.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Assembly - AB 319 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB319 Campos (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - AB 319 CAMPOS Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB319 Campos (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - AB 319 CAMPOS Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5729.). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3622.) |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14). |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22580 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53165 | New Code | See Bill Text |