CA AB318 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 14 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 18410 to, and to repeal and add Section 19135 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Franchise Tax Board: administration: penalties: legal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-24 - AB 318 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB318 Skinner By Hernandez (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - AB 318 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2012-08-31 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2012-08-24 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6234.).
2012-08-22 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-21 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4649.).
2012-08-15 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-14 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-06-28 From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2012-06-26 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-06-25 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2012-06-13 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-02-16 Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2012-01-26 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-01-26 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3606.)
2012-01-23 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-01-19 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
2012-01-10 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2011-05-02 In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-04-04 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-02-24 Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2011-02-10 From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2011-02-09 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code18410New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19571New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_318&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_bill_20110209_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_bill_20120104_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_bill_20120814_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_bill_20120829_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_bill_20120914_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_vote_20120109_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_vote_20120119_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_vote_20120126_1047AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_vote_20120613_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_vote_20120821_0423PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_318_vote_20120824_1022AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback