CA AB318 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4750.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Bureau of Automotive Repair: inspection fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-03 - Assembly - AB 318 EMMERSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB318 Emmerson By Ducheny (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 318 EMMERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB318 Emmerson By Ducheny (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 318 EMMERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m. | |
2009-09-03 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2974.) | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2051.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2009-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2009-06-10 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-06-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1355.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-03-25 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B. & P. | |
2009-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 4750.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |