CA AB278 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38566 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: Low
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 278 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB278 Gatto By Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 278 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB278 Gatto By Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 278 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6734.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6734.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6735.). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4983.). |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator De León. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1666.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38566 | New Code | See Bill Text |