CA AB2763 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10176.1 and 19869 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1936.01, 2924.12, 2924.17, 2924.19, and 2924.20 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 580d and 684.115 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 163, 201, 2510, 2601, 5122, 7122, 9122, and 12302 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 371, 380, 1514, 2105, 5106, 14381, 14382, 14652.5, 18002.5, 18022.5, and 23001 of the Financial Code, to amend Sections 6254.5, 7465, 7474, 7480, 13975.2, 13995.40.5, 65040.9, and 66620 of, to amend the heading of Part 4.5 (commencing with Section 13975) of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to amend and renumber Sections 13975.1 and 13978.6 of, to repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 13999) of Part 4.7 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 9.7 (commencing with Section 8790) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 44272.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 12414.31 and 12710 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 2802 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 22003 of, and to repeal Section 22553.2 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government operations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2763A& A.R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2763 Committee on ACC. & ADM. REV. (Fr By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2763A& A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2763 Committee on ACC. & ADM. REV. (Fr By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2763A& A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6668.). |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4920.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5114.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 26. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |