CA AB2753 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.37.5 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 54237.5 and 65588 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 17926 and 51505 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Assembly - AB 2753 H.& C.D. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CHAU (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2753 Committee on H. & C.D.(Chau) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2753 H.& C.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2753 Committee on H. & C.D.(Chau) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2753 H.& C.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5974.). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4378.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5113.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 20. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.37.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54237.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65588 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 51505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |