CA AB2749 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and renumber Sections 13997.2 and 13997.7 of, to amend Sections 12098.3, 63035, 63040, 63056, and 63089.5 of, and to add the heading of Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 12100) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to amend Section 44559.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Economic development.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2749 Committee on Jobs, Economic Devel (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2749 J., E.D.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2749 J., E.D.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4254.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4969.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 11. |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13997.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13997.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44559.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |