CA AB2743 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 203 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2743 Committee on L. & E. (R.Hern (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2743 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2743 L.& E. Assembly Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4300.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 4705.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 9). |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |