CA AB2737 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 116327 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to safe drinking water.
Title
Safe drinking water.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116327 | New Code | See Bill Text |