CA AB2726 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 361, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 361, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10511, 10512, and 10513 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
University of California: real property sales.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2726 Daly By Correa (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2726 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2726 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 361, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4408.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 5091.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |