CA AB2724 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1214.1 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 40509 of the Vehicle Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Failure to appear in court: fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2724 BRADFORD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2724 BRADFORD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4969.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |